Global Patent Index - EP 0990596 A1

EP 0990596 A1 2000-04-05 - Polyolefin film for making a package by folding

Title (en)

Polyolefin film for making a package by folding

Title (de)

Polyolefinfilm zum Herstellen einer Faltpackung

Title (fr)

Film à base de polyolefine pour former un emballage par pliage

Publication

EP 0990596 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420203 A

Priority

FR 9812581 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging material (1) is made from a polyolefin-based film some 38 microns thick, coated on its outer and inner surfaces with areas (20, 21) of a low-temperature sealing substance which allow the package to be sealed after folding over the product.

Abstract (fr)

Le film pour emballages de blocs rigides ou semi-rigides constitués de parois formées par pliage et scellage de portions dudit film, est caractérisé en ce que, a) il comprend un film à base de polyoléfine, b) la face extérieure dudit film comprend une couche de produit de thermoscellage formant des plages repérées, de manière à obtenir, après ledit thermoscellage qui suit ledit pliage, ledit emballage à parois fixées de manière stable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 65/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990596 A1 20000405; EP 0990596 B1 20040623; DE 69918238 D1 20040729; DE 69918238 T2 20050721; ES 2222676 T3 20050201; FR 2784079 A1 20000407; FR 2784079 B1 20001103

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EUROPE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EUROPE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20090201

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2222676

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69918238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030408

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI