Global Patent Index - EP 0990617 A1

EP 0990617 A1 2000-04-05 - Telescoping system

Title (en)

Telescoping system

Title (de)

Teleskopiersystem

Title (fr)

Système de télescopage

Publication

EP 0990617 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122301 A

Priority

  • EP 99122301 A
  • DE 19525627 A
  • DE 19546661 A
  • EP 96111252 A

Abstract (en)

The telescopic sections are locked in position by releasable locking bolts. On the bolt projecting out from the telescopic box towards the lift cylinder (31) and ending at the same distance therefrom there is a head which can be caught behind by a claw (712) which is mounted on the lift element of the lift cylinder (31) and interacts with the followers (411, 411') thereon so that the locking bolt can only be released when the followers are set and the followers can only be disengaged when the released bolt is set again after a complete lift. The follower bolts (411) and unlocking bolts (711) form parts of spring-tensioned pistons (41, 71) moving in bores (42, 72) off-set axially from each other.

Abstract (de)

Bei mehrschüssigen Teleskopiersystemen, deren teleskopierbare Schüsse von einem vorzugsweise einstufigen Hubzylinder überhoben werden, dessen Hubelement über vom Hubelement in Richtung auf den zu überhebenden Schuß verlagerbare Mitnehmer mit dem Schuß gekuppelt wird, wobei zum Überheben eine Verriegelung zwischen dem zu überhebenden Schuß und dem vorgelagerten Schuß über einen ebenfalls dem Hubelement des Hubzylinders zugeordneten Entriegelungsmechanismus aufgehoben werden muß, wird zur Erhöhung der Betriebssicherheit eine mechanische Zusammenfassung des Entriegelungsmechanismus mit dem Überhebemechanismus dergestalt vorgeschlagen, daß die Schußentriegelung erst möglich wird, wenn die Mitnehmer am zu überhebenden Schuß gesetzt sind und das Lösen der Mitnehmer vom überhobenen Schuß erst möglich wird, wenn die Schußverriegelung wieder zustande gekommen ist, im speziellen Fall über dem Entriegelungsgestänge (711, 711') zugeordnete Sperrbolzen (81, 81'), die bei ausgefahrenem Gestänge, also gekuppelten Schüssen des Teleskopiersystems, auf den eingefahrenen Mitnehmerbolzen (411, 411') aufsitzen und bei eingefahrenem Entriegelungsgestänge (711, 711'), also gelöster Kupplung, die ausgefahrenen, in Wirkeingriff mit dem zu teleskopierenden Schuß des Teleskopiersystems befindlichen Mitnehmerbolzen (411, 411') hinterfangen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/70; F15B 15/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/693 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01); F15B 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/26 (2013.01); B66C 23/708 (2013.01); F15B 15/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19525627 A1 19970123; DE 19546661 A1 19970619; EP 0990617 A1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010605

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 754646

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL