Global Patent Index - EP 0990626 A1

EP 0990626 A1 2000-04-05 - Polymer coated woven glass fabric and process for its production

Title (en)

Polymer coated woven glass fabric and process for its production

Title (de)

Kunststoffbeschichtetes Glas-Gittergewebe und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tissus de verre textile revêtu avec un polymère et procédé de production

Publication

EP 0990626 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112230 A

Priority

DE 19844387 A

Abstract (en)

Coating a glass fiber netting with thermoplastic polymer comprises passing the netting through an immersion bath of molten thermoplastic material and then through a blower to clear the mesh openings followed by a hot mangle station before cooling and winding. The netting is a woven fabric, with glass filaments in the warps and wefts as glass yarns or rovings, in a thickness of 22-2400 tex. The glass filaments can also contain other synthetic or carbon fibers. The plastics coating is applied at a rate of 10-30 wt% of the total weight, in a structure which can form a film over the woven netting as a reinforced film material. Sand can be bonded partially into the cladding. An Independent claim is included for a production process where the woven netting (1) is immersed in a bath (3) of molten thermoplastic cladding material (4), and mangled (6,7) while hot. Preferred Features: The hot plastics cladding material can be applied from an extruder as a paste over the woven netting, with a scraper to remove any surplus cladding. The mesh openings can be cleared by an air blower (8), and preferably with hot air (9). The plastics cladding can also be applied to the woven netting as a powder, such as by an electronic adhesion coating process, to be melted in a furnace shaft or a heated tunnel. The coated netting is passed through a cooling stretch (10). The glass fiber material can be cladded with a thermoplastics before weaving into the netting fabric, so that the glass fibers bond together when passed between heated rollers. The glass fiber filaments can be cladded with the thermoplastics material through an extruder. Hot sand is scattered over the surface of the finished and cladded woven netting material.

Abstract (de)

Kunststoffbeschichtetes Glas-Gittergewebe, insbesondere für die Putzarmierung oder als Geotextil, wobei das Beschichtungsmaterial thermoplastischer Kunststoff ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03C 25/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2006.01); D06N 3/00 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 3/0022 (2013.01); D03D 15/0011 (2013.01); D06N 3/0088 (2013.01); D06N 3/0093 (2013.01); D06N 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19844387 A1 20000330; DE 19844387 C2 20020307; AT 248134 T 20030915; EP 0990626 A1 20000405; EP 0990626 B1 20030827; ES 2201600 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130626

2014-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130625

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130625

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906753

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 248134 T

- Effective date: 20130625

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120526

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: VITRULAN TECHNICAL TEXTILES GMBH

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VITRULAN TECHNICAL TEXTILES GMBH

- Free text: VITRULAN TEXTILGLAS GMBH#BERNECKER STRASSE 8#95509 MARKTSCHORGAST (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VITRULAN TECHNICAL TEXTILES GMBH#ROEGITZSTRASSE 34#96523 HASELBACH (DE)

2009-12-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091001

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201600 T3

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906753 P 20031002

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOLL, ANDRE, DR. RER. NAT.

2002-09-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF WOVEN GLASS FABRIC COATED WITH A THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI