Global patent index - EP 0990691 A2

EP 0990691 A2 2000-04-05 - Luminescent mixture and fluorescent lamp for the illumination of food

Title (en)

Luminescent mixture and fluorescent lamp for the illumination of food

Title (de)

Leuchtstoffmischung und Leuchtstofflampe für Lebensmittelbeleuchtung

Title (fr)

Composition luminescente and fluorescente pour l'illumination des produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 0990691 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119226 A

Priority

DE 19844879 A

Abstract (en)

Phosphor mixture contains a halophosphate luminescent material containing solid Mn<2+> or a mixture of several halophosphates with different Mn<2+>, and red luminescent phosphor with an emission maximum of approximately 625 nm and a half intensity width of the emission of less than 100 nm. An Independent claim is also included for a phosphor lamp comprising two layers of the above phosphor mixture.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine neue Leuchtstoffmischung für eine Spezialleuchtstofflampe zur Beleuchtung von Lebensmitteln, insbesondere Fleisch- und Wurstwaren. Durch eine Mischung von Halophosphatleuchtstoffen mit einem Rotleuchtstoff mit einem Emissionsmaximum nahe 625 nm und durch optionale Zugabe eines schmalbandigen Grünleuchtstoffs lassen sich gute Schönungswirkungen und unterschiedliche spezielle Farbwiedergabeindizes in einem breiten Bereich einstellen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 11/08; H01J 61/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990691 A2 20000405; EP 0990691 A3 20020116; DE 19844879 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070907

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 09K 11/08 A, 7C 09K 11/73 B, 7H 01J 61/44 B, 7H 01J 61/48 B

2000-04-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LUMINESCENT MIXTURE AND FLUORESCENT LAMP FOR THE ILLUMINATION OF FOOD

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI