Global Patent Index - EP 0990695 A1

EP 0990695 A1 2000-04-05 - Fabric softener with dye transfer inhibiting properties

Title (en)

Fabric softener with dye transfer inhibiting properties

Title (de)

Weichspülmittel mit farberhaltender Wirkung

Title (fr)

Composition adoucissante inhibitant le transfert de colorants

Publication

EP 0990695 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118491 A

Priority

EP 98118491 A

Abstract (en)

Color-preserving fabric conditioner contains 3-25 wt. % component (A), comprising 75-97 wt. % quaternary di-(2-hydroxyethyl)- or di-(2-hydroxypropyl)-dimethylammonium or tri-(2-hydroxyethyl)- or tri-(2-hydroxypropyl)-methyl ammonium compound (I), and 3-25 wt. % other ammonium or amine compound(s), (B) 0.5-6 wt. % usual ancillaries and additives and (C) water to 100 wt. %. Color-preserving fabric conditioner contains 3-25 wt. % component (A), comprising (Aa) 75-97 wt. % quaternary di-(2-hydroxyethyl)- or di-(2-hydroxypropyl)-dimethylammonium or tri-(2-hydroxyethyl)- or tri-(2-hydroxypropyl)-methyl ammonium compound of formula (I), and (Ab) 3-25 wt. % other ammonium or amine compound(s) of formula (II), (III), (IV) and/or (V), (B) 0.5-6 wt. % usual ancillaries and additives and (C) water to 100 wt. %: R = methyl (-CH3) or a substituted ethyl group of the formula -CH2-CH(R<4>)-OR<1> or -CH2-CH(R<5>)-OR2; R = hydrogen (H) or CH3; R<1>, R<2> = at least 1-1.5 mole H, otherwise an acyl group, -C(O)-R<3>; R<3> = optionally substituted 13-19 carbon (C) hydrocarbyl, optionally with multiple bonds; a, b = 1-2; a+b = 2-10, especially 3-8; R<7> = optionally substituted 7-19 C hydrocarbyl; R<8-11> = -(CH2-CH2-O)n; n = 1-10 with the sum of all n = 8-20; A<-> = the anion of a quaternizing agent.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung sind Weichspülmittel mit farberhaltender Wirkung, enthaltend 3-25 Gew% der Komponente A), bestehend aus Aa) 75-97 Gew% quaternären Ammoniumverbindungen der allgemeinen Formel (I) <IMAGE> und 3-25 Gew% mindestens einer weiteren Verbindung und B) 0,5-6 Gew% üblicher Hilfs- und Zusatzstoffe, C) ad-100 Gew% Wasser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/62; C11D 1/645; C11D 3/28; C11D 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/645 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/645 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/0021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990695 A1 20000405; CA 2284422 A1 20000330; PL 335717 A1 20000410; US 6180593 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOLDSCHMIDT REWO GMBH & CO. KG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI