Global Patent Index - EP 0990710 A1

EP 0990710 A1 2000-04-05 - Magnesium alloy forging material and forged member, and method for manufacturing the forged member

Title (en)

Magnesium alloy forging material and forged member, and method for manufacturing the forged member

Title (de)

Schmiedewerkstoff aus einer Magnesiumlegierung und geschmiedetes Element und Herstellungsverfahren des geschmiedeten Elementes

Title (fr)

Matériau de forgeage en alliage de magnésium et élément forgé et méthode de fabrication de l'élément forgé

Publication

EP 0990710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99117054 A

Priority

JP 27850798 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides Mg alloy forging material and forged member containing, as well as a method for manufacturing the forged member, which are superior in both mechanical characteristics and forgeability at normal temperature and high temperature and relatively low in price. The magnesium alloy forging material contains at least aluminum and calcium and has a critical upsetting rate of not less than 70% at 300 DEG C. Also, the magnesium alloy forging material contains not less than 2 wt% and not more than 6 wt% of aluminum and not less than 0.5 wt% and not more than 4 wt% of calcium, and has a mean grain size of not more than 300 mu m. The forged member may be a valve lifter for an internal combustion engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 23/02; B21J 5/00; B21K 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/00 (2006.01); B21K 1/20 (2006.01); C22C 23/02 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/06 (2006.01); C23C 14/08 (2006.01); F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/06 (2013.01); B21J 5/00 (2013.01); B21K 1/20 (2013.01); C22C 23/02 (2013.01); F01L 1/14 (2013.01); F01L 3/02 (2013.01); F01L 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 4997622 A 19910305 - REGAZZONI GILLES [FR], et al
  • [XY] WO 9625529 A1 19960822 - INST LA TECHNOLOGIE DU MAGNESI [CA]
  • [YD] US 5409555 A 19950425 - FUJITA MAKOTO [JP], et al
  • [XD] EP 0799901 A1 19971008 - MAZDA MOTOR [JP]
  • [A] US 5239951 A 19930831 - RAO V DURGA N [US], et al
  • [A] US 4431445 A 19840214 - FURUSAWA SADAYOSHI [JP], et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 02 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
  • [Y] ED. BY MORDIKE B.L. AND KAINER K.U.: "Magnesium Alloys and their Applications", 1998, WERKSTOFF-INFORMATIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, FRANKFURT, GERMANY, XP002128350
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 02 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990710 A1 20000405; CN 1249355 A 20000405; JP 2000104137 A 20000411; KR 20000023503 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011008

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI