Global Patent Index - EP 0990714 A1

EP 0990714 A1 2000-04-05 - Combustible for thermal spraying

Title (en)

Combustible for thermal spraying

Title (de)

Brennstoff für das thermische Spritzen

Title (fr)

Combustible pour un procédé de pulvérisation thermique

Publication

EP 0990714 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117876 A

Priority

DE 19844934 A

Abstract (en)

A liquefied gas is used as the fuel for thermal spraying which delivers thermal energy for thermal coating.

Abstract (de)

Es werden mit der Erfindung neue Brennstoffe für das thermische Spritzen aufgezeigt, welche durch Verbrennung thermische Energie für das thermische Beschichten liefern. Als Alternative zu konventionellen Brennstoffen oder als Ergänzung zu konventionellen Brennstoffen eignet sich erfindungsgemäß verflüssigtes Gas als Brennstoff. Das verflüssigte Gas kann ein oder mehrere Kohlenwasserstoffe und/oder Kohlenwasserstoffverbindungen, insbesondere Methan enthalten. In Weiterbildung wird das verflüssigte Gas durch verflüssigtes Erdgas (LNG) gebildet. Als thermische Spritzverfahren kommen erfindungsgemäß die Verfahrensvarianten des Flammspritzens, des Hochgeschwindigkeits-Flammspritzens oder des Detonationsspritzens in Frage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/129 (2016.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990714 A1 20000405; DE 19844934 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030711

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI