Global Patent Index - EP 0990719 A1

EP 0990719 A1 2000-04-05 - Spinning device

Title (en)

Spinning device

Title (de)

Spinnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Métier à filer

Publication

EP 0990719 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112325 A

Priority

  • DE 19845460 A
  • DE 19926492 A

Abstract (en)

Radially inward projecting guide surfaces (16) in the sliver inlet (11) restrain the outer layers of the drawn sliver (10) while free passage is given to a core fiber bundle. On emerging from the inlet (11) a rotating air stream set up by air jets (21) wraps the outer fibers round the core to produce a yarn (26) in the spindle tube (13). The core fiber bundle comprises preferably 20 - 40% of the sliver. The guide surfaces (16) can take various forms, e.g. plates, slots or needles and can be flexible or their position can be made adjustable. The gap between the entry opening (14) of the spindle tube (13) and the end of the guide surfaces (16) is preferably 0.2 to 0.7 mm.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung gesponnener Fäden mittels eines Luftstromes. Der Luftstrom wirkt im Bereich zwischen einer Faserbandführung und der Spindel (13) auf die Fasern eines ungedrehten, von einem Streckwerk verstreckten und gelieferten Faserbandes (10) ein, um dieses zu drehen. Das Faserband (10) wird anschließend durch die Spindel (13) hindurchgeführt. Die Faserbandführung ist außerhalb einer gedachten Mittellinie (9) des laufenden Faserbandes (10) so angeordnet, daß die Fasern an der nach innen liegenden Oberfläche der Faserbandführung entlanggeführt werden. Die Faserbandführung besteht aus zueinander beabstandeten Faserführungselementen (16), die den freien Durchtritt eines Kernfaserbündels gestatten. Mit der erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtung ist ein verbesserter Spinnprozeß bei hoher Produktivität mit hohen Fadengeschwindigkeiten und erhöhter Garnfestigkeit möglich. Die Spinnvorrichtung läßt sich kostengünstig herstellen und betreiben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/11 (2006.01); D01H 1/115 (2006.01); D01H 4/02 (2006.01); D01H 4/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/115 (2013.01); D01H 4/02 (2013.01); D01H 4/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4036119 A1 19910516 - MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990719 A1 20000405; EP 0990719 B1 20030528; CZ 298758 B6 20080116; CZ 9903437 A3 20000412; JP 2000110032 A 20000418; JP 4298869 B2 20090722; US 6209304 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170626

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: LEVERKUSER STRASSE 65, 42897 REMSCHEID (DE)

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59905725

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2013-08-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: W. SCHLAFHORST AG AND CO., DE

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905725 P 20030703

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI