Global Patent Index - EP 0990720 A1

EP 0990720 A1 2000-04-05 - Support disc for a rotor spinning device

Title (en)

Support disc for a rotor spinning device

Title (de)

Stützscheibe einer Rotorspinneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Disque de support pour un dispositif de filature à rotor

Publication

EP 0990720 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112328 A

Priority

DE 19845237 A

Abstract (en)

A bearing disk has perforations (5) to provide signal markings to an optical speed sensor. The outer perforation wall (13) is at an angle ( alpha ) to the axis of rotation (27), preferably between 60 and 85 degrees , to prevent deposition of fly or dust.

Abstract (de)

Bei Rotorspinneinrichtungen, deren Rotoren in einer Stützscheibenlagerung gelagert sind und bei denen eine Stützscheibe (1) Öffnungen (5, 9) aufweist, die der berührungslosen Drehzahlmessung zur optischen Steuerung eines Anspinnwagens dienen, können sich in den Öffnungen (5, 9) Ablagerungen von Schmutz, insbesondere Feinstaub, aufbauen. Dies beeinträchtigt die Signalerfassung. Der zum Außenrand der Stützscheibe (1) hin gelegene Teil der Innenfläche (19) der Öffnungen (5, 9) einer erfindungsgemäßen Stützscheibe (1) bildet einen solchen Winkel zu einer Parallelen zur Rotationsachse (27), daß der Aufbau von Schmutzablagerungen verhindert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/12; D01H 13/16; D01H 13/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/12 (2006.01); D01H 4/42 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D01H 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/165 (2013.01); D01H 4/12 (2013.01); D01H 13/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990720 A1 20000405; EP 0990720 B1 20030702; CN 1250119 A 20000412; DE 19845237 A1 20000406; JP 2000110034 A 20000418; US 6269622 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906169 P 20030807

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI