Global patent index - EP 0990721 A1

EP 0990721 A1 2000-04-05 - Multiple twister

Title (en)

Multiple twister

Title (de)

Mehrfachzwirnmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de torsion multiple

Publication

EP 0990721 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99118404 A

Priority

JP 27685098 A

Abstract (en)

In an individual-spindle-drive type double twister comprising a spindle motor 3 for each spindle that drives a spindle shaft 1 and twists a yam Y that forms a balloon around a yarn supplying package P while simultaneously winding the yarn, a yarn tension detection device 11 for outputting a tension detection signal depending on the variation of the tension of the travelling yarn Y while in contact with the yarn Y is provided adjacent to a balloon guide 5 that converges the balloon, on the downstream side of the balloon guide 5, and a display device 16 is also provided to display uniformity (p) and temporal waveforms as information indicating the temporal variation of the tension detection signal. The present invention thus enables even a small variation in balloon tension to be accurately recognized and also enables inappropriately produced packages to be identified. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/32; D01H 1/10; D01H 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2006.01); B65H 59/40 (2006.01); D01H 1/10 (2006.01); D01H 13/14 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D01H 13/22 (2006.01); D01H 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/32 (2013.01); B65H 59/40 (2013.01); D01H 1/10 (2013.01); D01H 13/16 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990721 A1 20000405; JP 2000110039 A 20000418; KR 20000023528 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020722

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020607

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI