Global Patent Index - EP 0990722 A1

EP 0990722 A1 2000-04-05 - Method for forming a sample warp and sample warper

Title (en)

Method for forming a sample warp and sample warper

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer Musterkette und Musterketten-Schärmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode pour obtenir une chaîne d'échantillonnage et ourdissoir d'échantillonnage

Publication

EP 0990722 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117601 A

Priority

DE 19845245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19845245C1] Yarns (12) are wrapped on the conveyors by rotating guides (11). When a particular yarn is momentarily not required by the winding pattern, it is held in a clamp (19) and cut between the clamp and the drum (20). It remains in the guide (11) and is immediately available when required by releasing the clamp (19). An Independent claim is also included for a sample warper with rotating guides (11) where each guide is fitted with a clamp (19) and cutter (20). A yarn retention device, e.g. a suction nozzle (23), holds the free yarn ends (22). The clamp (19) and cutter (20) can be actuated by a pneumatic cylinder (25) or by a simple lobe cam arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Bei einen Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer Musterkette werden unterschiedliche Fäden (12) durch rotierende Fadenführer (11) von einen synchron hiermit umlaufenden Drehgatter (7) abgezogen und auf an Umfang einer drehfest gehaltenen Trommel angeordnete achsparallel verlaufende Transportbänder abgelegt. Zeitweilig nicht benötigte Fäden (12) werden durch Klemmung mit einen Fadenführer (11) verbunden und zwischen der Klemmstelle (19) und der Trommel abgeschnitten. Bei erneutem Bedarf wird das freie Fadenende (22) stationär festgehalten und die Klemmung aufgehoben. Bei einer Musterketten-Schärmaschine, mit der dieses Verfahren durchgeführt werden kann, ist jeden Fadenführer (11) eine mit ihm umlaufende Klemmstelle (19) zugeordnet. Eine Schneidvorrichtung (20) dient dem Abschneiden der Fäden (12) zwischen Klemmstelle (19) und Trommel (1). An Maschinengestell ist eine stationäre Haltevorrichtung (21) für das freie Fadenende (22) angeordnet. Auf diese Weise läßt sich eine Vielzahl unterschiedlicher Muster in relativ kurzer Zeit herstellen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845245 C1 19990923; CN 1252464 A 20000510; EP 0990722 A1 20000405; EP 0990722 B1 20020320; JP 2000110044 A 20000418; JP 3263050 B2 20020304; TW 452611 B 20010901; US 6233798 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2003-09-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030916

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030910

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901003 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010628

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI