Global Patent Index - EP 0990724 A3

EP 0990724 A3 2000-12-13 - Thread-clamping and -severing device for knitting machines

Title (en)

Thread-clamping and -severing device for knitting machines

Title (de)

Fadenklemm- und Schneidvorrichtung für Strickmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour pincer et sectionner des fils dans un métier à tricoter

Publication

EP 0990724 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118146 A

Priority

DE 19844833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0990724A2] Several clamping and cutting positions (11 -18) are arranged in an arc in a plane at right angles to the needle bed. A hook (31) on a swinging yarn allocation guide (30) picks up the yarn (F2) and places it in the appropriate extended clamping and cutting needle (40). The drive has a selector mechanism which also prevents collision of the needles (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/54; D04B 15/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 7/26 (2006.01); D04B 15/56 (2006.01); D04B 15/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/565 (2013.01); D04B 7/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990724 A2 20000405; EP 0990724 A3 20001213; EP 0990724 B1 20040728; CN 1155748 C 20040630; CN 1249370 A 20000405; DE 19844833 A1 20000413; JP 2000110054 A 20000418; JP 3143873 B2 20010307; PT 990724 E 20041231

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130911

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050911

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040728

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: H. *STOLL G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20050930

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-10-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402910

2004-10-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910051 P 20040902

2004-08-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GR IT PT

2004-07-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GR IT PT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010512

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GR IT PT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI