Global Patent Index - EP 0990735 A1

EP 0990735 A1 2000-04-05 - Process for making a cable for constructions, cable thus realised and individually wrapped strand for carrying out the process

Title (en)

Process for making a cable for constructions, cable thus realised and individually wrapped strand for carrying out the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kabeln für Bauwerke, auf diese Weise hergestellte Kabel und individuell umhüllte Litze zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'un cable de structure pour ouvrage de construction, cable ainsi réalisé, et toron individuellement gainé pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0990735 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00100022 A

Priority

  • EP 99400844 A
  • FR 9804566 A

Abstract (en)

The cable is made from a number of strands (24) enclosed in individual sleeves (25) with bulges (26) at regular intervals and filled with a self-hardening material such as a cement mortar, a polymer or resin. The bulges in the sleeves making up one cable are offset lengthwise relative to one another.

Abstract (fr)

On installe des torons individuellement gainés (24) dans un tube, on injecte un produit de remplissage dans le tube, autour des torons, et on laisse durcir le produit de remplissage. La gaine individuelle (25) de chaque toron présente des renflements (26) espacés suivant la direction longitudinale du câble. Les torons sont installés dans le tube de façon telle que les renflements de leurs gaines respectives soient décalés longitudinalement les uns par rapport aux autres, ce qui ménage des intervalles entre les torons pour faciliter le bon remplissage du tube. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 11/00 (2006.01); D07B 1/14 (2006.01); D07B 1/16 (2006.01); E01D 11/02 (2006.01); E01D 11/04 (2006.01); E01D 19/16 (2006.01); E01D 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/16 (2013.01); D07B 5/005 (2013.01); D07B 5/006 (2015.07); D07B 1/144 (2013.01); D07B 1/162 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2087 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2088 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2091 (2013.01); D07B 2501/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950762 A1 19991020; EP 0950762 B1 20031022; AT 252666 T 20031115; DE 69912180 D1 20031127; DE 69912180 T2 20040729; DK 0950762 T3 20040223; EP 0990735 A1 20000405; ES 2209350 T3 20040616; FR 2777296 A1 19991015; FR 2777296 B1 20000616; JP 2001192988 A 20010717; JP 3828309 B2 20061004; JP H11323823 A 19991126; NO 20004346 A 19991011; NO 20004346 D0 20000901; NO 318325 B1 20050307; NO 991657 A 19991011; NO 991657 D0 19990408; PT 950762 E 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010810

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STUBLER, JEROME

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STUBLER, JEROME

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000104

2000-04-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 950762

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI