Global Patent Index - EP 0990738 A1

EP 0990738 A1 2000-04-05 - Method for remotely controlling, adjusting and maintaining a spreading device

Title (en)

Method for remotely controlling, adjusting and maintaining a spreading device

Title (de)

Verfahren für fernbediente Steuerung, Regelung und Wartung einer Streuvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de controle, de réglage, et de maintenance à distance d'un dispositif d'épandage

Publication

EP 0990738 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440248 A

Priority

FR 9812269 A

Abstract (en)

The spray system (1) has a rotating head (4) and may be controlled by a module (13) placed in the driver's cab (2) on or close to the driver's seat. An elongated lead (16) may connect this unit with a central processing unit (17) which may be in a fixed location. The central processing unit may contain details of the material being sprayed on a road.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif et un procédé de contrôle, de réglage et de maintenance à distance d'un dispositif d'épandage (1) de produits de déneigement monté sur un véhicule porteur (2) et comportant des moyens d'épandage (3) et d'extraction (6) entraînés par des actionneurs (5, 12, 12'), le fonctionnement de ce dispositif d'épandage (1) étant commandé depuis un pupitre de commande (13) mémorisant des données de consigne d'épandage. Le procédé est caractérisé en ce que : l'on relève les caractéristiques de fonctionnement des actionneurs (5, 12, 12'), les données de consigne, les codes d'identification du dispositif d'épandage (1) et du véhicule (2) pour les adresser à une unité de traitement centrale (17) ; l'on compare les caractéristiques relevées à celles déduites d'une table étalon mémorisée dans l'unité centrale (17) ; en cas de non concordance, on détermine les constantes de correction de réglage à effectuer au niveau de ces caractéristiques; on introduit, au pupitre de commande (13), ces constantes pour corriger les caractéristiques de fonctionnement de l'actionneur (5, 12, 12'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 10/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990738 A1 20000405; FR 2783958 A1 20000331; FR 2783958 B1 20001201; PL 335477 A1 20000410

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050608

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030828

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI