Global Patent Index - EP 0990740 A1

EP 0990740 A1 2000-04-05 - DISPLAY CONTROLLER OF CONSTRUCTION MACHINE

Title (en)

DISPLAY CONTROLLER OF CONSTRUCTION MACHINE

Title (de)

ANZEIGESTEUERGERÄT FÜR EINE BAUMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CONTROLEUR D'AFFICHAGE DE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION

Publication

EP 0990740 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99913703 A

Priority

  • JP 9902059 W
  • JP 10809598 A

Abstract (en)

In a display controller for a construction machine which allows more room for a cab to enable an improved working efficiency of the operator, a plurality of control units 20, 22, 25 controls the respective operations of various parts of the construction machine based on information collected from detecting means provided in the individual construction machine part, and a display unit 26 displays the respective operation states of the individual construction machine parts, the display unit being connected to the individual control unit with a common communication line 30. The display unit 26 includes inputting means 28 for inputting commands to change display information representing the operation states of the individual construction machine parts, and displaying means 27, 29 for reading from the individual control units the display information corresponding to the inputted commands and displaying the read display information. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/26; E02F 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/24 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); E02F 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/26 (2013.01); E02F 9/2235 (2013.01); E02F 9/2285 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990740 A1 20000405; EP 0990740 A4 20020605; EP 0990740 B1 20070627; EP 0990740 B8 20070905; CN 1086762 C 20020626; CN 1263577 A 20000816; DE 69936369 D1 20070809; DE 69936369 T2 20080313; JP H11303151 A 19991102; KR 100371275 B1 20030205; WO 9954558 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080419

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080419

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-02-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-09-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070927

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69936369

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-08-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-06-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE