Global Patent Index - EP 0990748 A1

EP 0990748 A1 2000-04-05 - Scaffold standard with improved stress bearing capacity

Title (en)

Scaffold standard with improved stress bearing capacity

Title (de)

Vertikales Gerüstrohr mit verbesserter Lastaufnahmefähigkeit

Title (fr)

Montant d'échafaudage à reprise de charge améliorée

Publication

EP 0990748 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118882 A

Priority

DE 19844613 A

Abstract (en)

The vertical pole (1) is reinforced in the area that comes into contact with the device for connecting horizontal and diagonal poles. Reinforcement is provided by having greater wall thickness (3a) or by using a collar, dowel pin or ring mounted under the connector.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein vertikales Gerüstrohr (1), an dem mindestens eine Haltevorrichtung (2) angebracht ist, in die horizontale und/oder diagonale Gerüstrohre einhängbar sind, wobei das Gerüstrohr (1) in dem Bereich, in dem die Haltevorrichtung (2) an dem vertikalen Gerüstrohr (1) angebracht ist, jeweils eine Verstärkung (3a,3b,3c,4,5,6,7) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/30 (2006.01); E04G 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/307 (2013.01); E04G 7/306 (2013.01); E04G 7/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19844613 A1 20000330; CA 2284123 A1 20000329; EP 0990748 A1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010906

2001-05-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001005;LT PAYMENT 20001005;LV PAYMENT 20001005;MK PAYMENT 20001005;RO PAYMENT 20001005;SI PAYMENT 20001005

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI