Global patent index - EP 0990752 A2

EP 0990752 A2 2000-04-05 - Lock cylinder replacement piece for locks

Title (en)

Lock cylinder replacement piece for locks

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder-Ersatzstück für Schlösser

Title (fr)

Pièce de rechange remplacant une serrure cylindrique dans des serrures

Publication

EP 0990752 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119384 A

Priority

DE 29817567 U

Abstract (en)

The cylinder body (10) and closure element (12) for operating the lock are connected by a restoring spring (14) and are turned towards each other against the force of the restoring spring. In its initial position, the closure element is pre-tensioned against a thrust piece in the cylinder body by the restoring spring. The closure element is fixed to a bearing sleeve (18). The cylinder body has two especially annular bearing parts (20) placed onto the bearing sleeve and between which is a bearing part (22) of the closure element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Schließzylinder-Ersatzstück, insbesondere Zylinderadapter, für Schlösser, insbesondere Einsteckschlösser für Türen, mit einem Zylinderkörper (10) und einem Schließelement (12) zur Betätigung des Schlosses, wobei der Zylinderkörper (10) und das Schließelement (12) durch eine Rückstellfeder (14) miteinander gekoppelt und gegen die Rückstellkraft der Rückstellfeder (14) gegeneinander verdrehbar sind. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem ein Schließsystem mit einem derartigen Schließzylinder-Ersatzstück und einem Schloß. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/00; E05B 9/04; E05B 15/04; E05B 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2013.01); E05B 15/04 (2013.01); E05B 2009/047 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817567 U1 19990107; EP 0990752 A2 20000405; EP 0990752 A3 20030312

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050622

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 3/00 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 9/04 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 15/04 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 63/00 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 33/00 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI