Global Patent Index - EP 0990756 A2

EP 0990756 A2 2000-04-05 - Access control system

Title (en)

Access control system

Title (de)

Zugangskontrollsystem

Title (fr)

Système de commande d'accès

Publication

EP 0990756 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114000 A

Priority

DE 19844360 A

Abstract (en)

The system has at least one mobile transponder (36) with an authorization code carried by a person and at least one local control station (10,12,14). The control station has a reader (28) for contactlessly reading the code when the transponder approaches the reader and for transmitting the code to a superior and/or central code evaluation device (16). Biometric measurement of intrinsic characteristics of the person carrying the transponder and comparison with stored biometric data are performed locally. Depending on the comparison result a data word contg. the authorization code word is transmitted via the network (26) to the code evaluation device.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Zugangskontrollsystem beschrieben. Das Zugangskontrollsystem umfaßt wenigstens einen von einer Person mitzuführenden mobilen Transponder (36) mit einem Berechtigungscode und wenigstens eine lokale Kontrollstation (10,12,14) mit einem Lesegerät (28). Mit diesem ist der Berechtigungscode des Transponders (36) bei Annäherung an das Lesegerät (28) berührungslos lesbar und über ein Netzwerk (26)(einer übergeordneten und/oder zentralen Code-Auswerteeinrichtung (16,12) übermittelbar. Zusätzlich ist eine biometrische Erfassung von unveräußerlichen Merkmalen der den Transponder (36) mitführenden Person und ein Vergleich der erfaßten biometrischen Merkmale mit gespeicherten biometrischen Daten lokal vornehmbar. Abhängig vom Ergebnis des Vergleichs ist ein den Berechtigungscode des Transponders (36) enthaltendes Datenwort oder das Datenwort selbst über das Netzwerk (26) zur Code-Auswerteeinrichtung (16,12) übermittelbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00563 (2013.01); G07C 9/00087 (2013.01); G07C 9/00103 (2013.01); G07C 9/00111 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00095 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990756 A2 20000405; EP 0990756 A3 20020130; DE 19844360 A1 20000413; US 6624739 B1 20030923

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040921

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI