Global Patent Index - EP 0990758 A2

EP 0990758 A2 2000-04-05 - Additional lock for espagnolette

Title (en)

Additional lock for espagnolette

Title (de)

Zusatzschloss an einem Treibstangenverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure additionelle pour crémone

Publication

EP 0990758 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112639 A

Priority

DE 19841544 A

Abstract (en)

The driving rod fastening has a profiled-headed bolt (27) operated by a sneck nut (19) and engaging into a locking swivel bracket (7). A slide piece (43) moved by the driving rod is moved into a locking position by the arm (29) of the sneck nut. The profiled headed bolt forms a end-side guide slit (30) into which protrudes a guide protuberance (31) on the housing side. The profiled headed bolt and sneck nut belong to a bearing bracket (17) which also forms a guide ridge (44) forte slide piece.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Zusatzschloß (6) an einem Treibstangenverschluß (1), welches einen durch Drückernußbetätigung ausschließbaren und rückschließbaren Profilkopfriegel (27) aufweist zum Eingriff in einen festrahmenseitig gelagerten Sperrschwenkbügel (7), welcher Profilkopfriegel (27) zusätzlich auch durch Treibstangenverlagerung zurückschließbar ist. Zwecks schließtechnischer Verbesserung schlägt die Erfindung vor, einen von der Treibstange (11) mitgeschleppten Schieber (43) vorzusehen, der bei Verlagerung der Treibstange (11) in eine Sperrstellung des Treibstangenverschlusses (1) durch Beaufschlagung eines Armes (29) der Drückernuß (19) den in einer Offenstellung des Treibstangenverschlusses (1) vorschließbaren Profilkopfriegel (27) zurückschließt und sich, eine Drückernußbewegung sperrend, vor den Arm (29) legt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 17/16 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1841 (2013.01); E05C 17/166 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0493 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841544 A1 20000323; DE 19841544 C2 20001116; EP 0990758 A2 20000405; EP 0990758 A3 20021030

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05C 9/02 A, 7E 05C 17/16 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI