Global Patent Index - EP 0990759 A1

EP 0990759 A1 2000-04-05 - Hinge for a vehicle closure member

Title (en)

Hinge for a vehicle closure member

Title (de)

Scharnier für einen Kraftfahrzeugflügel

Title (fr)

Charnière pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0990759 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402404 A

Priority

FR 9812353 A

Abstract (en)

The hinge comprises a first knuckle (1) fixed to the door and a second knuckle (2) fixed to the vehicle structure. The two knuckles are fixed by an articulation spindle (7). The second knuckle comprises a fixing plate (21) provided with a pilot peg (5) which is inserted through a bore in the structure and acts as a positioning reference for the hinge. The peg can move axially on the plate so as to occupy an adjustment position in which the body of the peg allows a modification of the position of the second knuckle.

Abstract (fr)

Charnière (10) pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant un premier charnon (1), fixé à l'ouvrant, et un second charnon (2), fixé à un élément de structure du véhicule, solidarisés entre eux par un axe d'articulation (7), ledit second charnon (1) comportant une platine de fixation (21) munie d'un pion pilote (5) s'insérant à travers un alésage de l'élément de structure pour servir de référence de positionnement à ladite charnière (10), caractérisée en ce que ledit pion pilote (5) est déplaçable axialement sur la platine (21) afin d'occuper une position de réglage dans laquelle le corps du pion pilote (5) permet une modification de la position du second charnon (2) sur l'élément de structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/121 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990759 A1 20000405; FR 2784135 A1 20000407; FR 2784135 B1 20001027

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061020

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041220

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2001-02-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-02-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI