Global Patent Index - EP 0990760 A1

EP 0990760 A1 2000-04-05 - Garage door

Title (en)

Garage door

Title (de)

Garagentor

Title (fr)

Porte de garage

Publication

EP 0990760 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98203271 A

Priority

EP 98203271 A

Abstract (en)

The garage door is formed from a tipping rigid frame (30) the base of which is vertically guided in a fixed chassis (36). A sectional panel (74) is only connected to the frame by a hinge (46) at its base. During operation the panel leaves the frame using guide rollers (76) supported by rods (38) around which the frame pivots.

Abstract (fr)

La porte est déplaçable dans une baie entre une position verticale fermée et une position relevée sensiblement horizontale et est constituée d'un cadre basculant rigide (30) dont la base est guidée verticalement dans un châssis fixe (36) et d'un panneau sectionnel (74) qui n'est relié au cadre (30) que par une charnière (46) à sa base et qui lors de la manoeuvre est sorti du cadre par des galets de guidage (76) supportés par des bielles (38) autour desquelles pivote le cadre (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/44 (2006.01); E05D 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/485 (2013.01); E05D 15/445 (2013.01); E06B 1/522 (2013.01); E05D 15/24 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990760 A1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020308

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TADDEI, SILVIO

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI