Global Patent Index - EP 0990761 A2

EP 0990761 A2 2000-04-05 - Composite wood-aluminium window frame

Title (en)

Composite wood-aluminium window frame

Title (de)

Holz-Aluminium-Rahmen für Fenster

Title (fr)

Cadre de fenêtre mixte bois-aluminium

Publication

EP 0990761 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99119211 A

Priority

IT PD980229 A

Abstract (en)

A composite wood/aluminium structure for the manufacture of door and window frames is described and comprises a first, wooden structural element (10, 60), a second, aluminium structural element (11, 61), and joining means (12, 62) between the structural elements. The joining means comprise a plurality of clips (30) disposed at intervals along the structural elements and connected to the first structural element (10, 60) by a restrained coupling and to the second structural element (11, 61) by a shaped coupling, both couplings being releasable and being the sole means of connection between the elements and the clips (30, 130,230) so that the connection between the structural elements (10, 11) is releasable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/302 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990761 A2 20000405; EP 0990761 A3 20020130; IT 1302506 B1 20000905; IT PD980229 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TENZON, FRANCO

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI