Global Patent Index - EP 0990766 A2

EP 0990766 A2 2000-04-05 - Drill tip

Title (en)

Drill tip

Title (de)

Bohrspitze

Title (fr)

Pointe de forage

Publication

EP 0990766 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99103252 A

Priority

DE 19844820 A

Abstract (en)

At least one cutting profile is formed as a guide profile (4,5) in such a way that on rotation around the drill axis (6) it opens out a space (10) limited against the bore hole wall (8) between the area of the at least one flushing medium outlet (3) and the drill point end (7). On rotation, the flushing medium coming from the at least one outlet is guided radially to the bore hole wall and a radially outwardly directed movement force is exerted on the material in the area of the limited space (10).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bohrspitze für ein Bohrrohr zur Durchführung von Spülbohrungen in Lockergestein mit wenigstens einem stirnseitig an der Bohrspitze angeordneten Schneidprofil und wenigstens einem Spülmittelauslaß. Die Erfindung sieht vor, daß das wenigstens eine Schneidprofil als Leitprofil (4, 5) derart ausgebildet ist, daß es bei der Rotation um die Bohrachse (6) einen gegen die Bohrlochwandung (8) abgegrenzten Raum (10) zwischen dem Bereich des wenigstens einen Spülmittelauslasses (3) und dem Bohrspitzenabschluß (7) aufspannt, und daß bei der Rotation das aus dem wenigstens einen Auslaß (3) austretende Spülmittel radial auf die Bohrlochwandung (8) lenkbar ist und eine radial nach außen gerichtete Bewegungskraft auf das im Bereich des abgegrenzten Raums (10) befindliche Material ausgeübt wird. Durch die Erfindung wird erreicht, daß der gelöste Boden bewußt in förderbare und nicht förderbare Bodenanteile separiert wird und beide Anteile für sich bohrleistungsoptimiert weiterbehandelt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/60; E21B 10/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/42 (2006.01); E21B 10/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/42 (2013.01); E21B 10/60 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990766 A2 20000405; EP 0990766 A3 20001004; EP 0990766 B1 20040901; AT 275235 T 20040915; DE 19844820 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MARKS THOMAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MARKS THOMAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2004-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910381

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

2004-09-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MARKS, THOMAS, DIPL.ING.

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARKS, THOMAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI