Global Patent Index - EP 0990766 A3

EP 0990766 A3 2000-10-04 - Drill tip

Title (en)

Drill tip

Title (de)

Bohrspitze

Title (fr)

Pointe de forage

Publication

EP 0990766 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103252 A

Priority

DE 19844820 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0990766A2] At least one cutting profile is formed as a guide profile (4,5) in such a way that on rotation around the drill axis (6) it opens out a space (10) limited against the bore hole wall (8) between the area of the at least one flushing medium outlet (3) and the drill point end (7). On rotation, the flushing medium coming from the at least one outlet is guided radially to the bore hole wall and a radially outwardly directed movement force is exerted on the material in the area of the limited space (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/60; E21B 10/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/42 (2006.01); E21B 10/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/42 (2013.01); E21B 10/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990766 A2 20000405; EP 0990766 A3 20001004; EP 0990766 B1 20040901; AT 275235 T 20040915; DE 19844820 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MARKS THOMAS

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MARKS THOMAS

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2004-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910381 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

2004-09-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARKS, THOMAS, DIPL.ING.

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARKS, THOMAS

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI