Global Patent Index - EP 0990767 A1

EP 0990767 A1 2000-04-05 - Process for the preparation of containment barriers impermeable to fluids

Title (en)

Process for the preparation of containment barriers impermeable to fluids

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von flüssigkeitsdichten Rückhaltebarrieren

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la production de barrières de confinement imperméables aux fluids

Publication

EP 0990767 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99118831 A

Priority

IT MI982123 A

Abstract (en)

Process for the preparation of containment barriers impermeable to fluids, which comprises: a) hydraulic fracturing of the ground to create extensive fissures, the above fracturing being effected by injecting, under pressure and through wells, compositions selected from: i) aqueous solutions or dispersions of materials capable of gelling; ii) aqueous dispersions of solids; iii) materials, or relative solutions/dispersions, capable of solidifying on cooling; b) subsequent maintenance under pressure until the formation of the above containment barriers, essentially consisting of compositions (i)-(iii).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 33/138; E02D 19/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/00 (2006.01); E02D 19/16 (2006.01); E02D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 19/16 (2013.01); E02D 31/00 (2013.01); E02D 2250/003 (2013.01); E02D 2300/0004 (2013.01); E02D 2300/004 (2013.01); E02D 2300/0082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990767 A1 20000405; EA 002282 B1 20020228; EA 199900788 A2 20000424; EA 199900788 A3 20001030; IT 1302588 B1 20000929; IT MI982123 A1 20000403; JP 2000107745 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990924;LT PAYMENT 19990924;LV PAYMENT 19990924;MK PAYMENT 19990924;RO PAYMENT 19990924;SI PAYMENT 19990924

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990924;LT PAYMENT 19990924;LV PAYMENT 19990924;MK PAYMENT 19990924;RO PAYMENT 19990924;SI PAYMENT 19990924