Global Patent Index - EP 0990768 A1

EP 0990768 A1 2000-04-05 - Method for building a tunnel construction under an existing railway track

Title (en)

Method for building a tunnel construction under an existing railway track

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erstellen eines Tunnelbauwerks unter einer bestehenden Gleisanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé de construction d'un ouvrage pour tunnel sous une voie ferrée existante

Publication

EP 0990768 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119429 A

Priority

DE 19844888 A

Abstract (en)

At least two vertical steel beams are installed in the ground where the tunnel work intersects with the tracks (1). They support horizontal loadbearing crossbeams (14,15) for supporting temporary bridges (6-9) for the tracks while tunnel construction proceeds underneath.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Erstellen eines Tunnelbauwerks unter einer bestehenden Gleisanlage (1) vorgeschlagen, mit dem auch größere Abschnitte einer Gleisanlage durch Verschieben eines vorgefertigten Verschubkörpers untertunnelt werden können, um den Zugverkehr über die Gleisanlage während der Baumaßnahme möglichst wenig zu beeinträchtigen. Erfindungsgemäß werden dazu im Kreuzungsbereich zwischen Tunnelbauwerk und Gleisanlage (1) mindestens zwei Vertikalträger (16, 17) zum Abstützen mindestens eines horizontal ausgerichteten Auflagerjochs (14, 15) installiert, wobei das Auflagerjoch (14, 15) als Auflage für mindestens eine Hilfsbrückenkonstruktion (6 bis 9) zum Abfangen des Gleises (2, 3) dient. Danach wird der Boden im Kreuzungsbereich ausgebaut. Anschließend wird der Verschubkörper (4) in den Kreuzungsbereich verschoben, wobei das Gleis (2, 3) über die Hilfsbrückenkonstruktionen (6 bis 9) und das Auflagerjoch (14, 15) sukzessive von dem Vertikalträger (16, 17) auf den Verschubkörper (4) umgelagert wird. Parallel zum Verschieben des Verschubkörpers (4) werden die entlasteten Vertikalträger (16, 17) rückgebaut. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/005 (2013.01); E01B 2/006 (2013.01); E01B 2/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990768 A1 20000405; EP 0990768 B1 20031210; DE 19844888 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908008

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908008 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030314

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BILFINGER BERGER AG

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI