Global patent index - EP 0990770 A1

EP 0990770 A1 2000-04-05 - Blading for highly loaded turbines

Title (en)

Blading for highly loaded turbines

Title (de)

Hochbelastete Turbinenbeschaufelung

Title (fr)

Aubage pour turbines fortement sollicitèes

Publication

EP 0990770 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810980 A

Priority

EP 98810980 A

Abstract (en)

The turbine has an axial turbine stage of guide blade row (LE) and rotor blade row (LA) in a common housing (30) with intake section (31) and outlet section (32). The ratio of axial chord length (Sax) to height (h) of the blade rows for a turbine part located between intake and outlet sections, is chosen, so that a figure RSH is larger than 1. RSH is.................. P (W) = turbine output p (Pa) = arithmetical mean between intake and outlet pressure of turbine z (-) = number of stages m (kg/s) = working medium mass flow rate through turbine N (1/s) = RPM hi (m) = height of blade in row i, on outlet side of blade DM,i(m)= average mean of outer hub diameter and inner housing diameter measured on outlet side of blade in row i, sax,i (m) = max. axial chord length of blade in same row.

Abstract (de)

Zur Reduktion der Stufenanzahl einer Turbine, und damit verbunden der Baulänge und der Kosten, ist eine Beschaufelung mit hohem stufenspezifischen Enthalpieumsatz einzusetzen. Dabei sollen die Nachteile herkömmlicher hochbelasteter Beschaufelungen wie gesteigerte Sekundärströmungsverluste durch Schaufeln grosser Sehnenlänge und vergleichsweise geringer Höhe, sowie die Ausführung der Turbine in der aufwendigen Kammerbauart vermieden werden. Aus diesen Forderungen resultiert eine hochbelastete schlanke Schaufelbauart mit grosser Umlenkung. Eine Turbine mit erfindungsgemässer Beschaufelung wird durch einen Belastungsparameter RSH charakterisiert, der bei der erfindungsgemässen HRSH-Beschaufelung im Gegensatz zu herkömmlichen Bauarten grösser als 1 ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/00; F01D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 15/02 (2006.01); F01D 5/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/06 (2006.01); F01D 5/14 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/06 (2013.01); F01D 5/00 (2013.01); Y10S 416/02 (2013.01); Y10S 416/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990770 A1 20000405; EP 0990770 B1 20030625; CN 1218115 C 20050907; CN 1249393 A 20000405; DE 59808832 D1 20030731; JP 2000110503 A 20000418; JP 4475703 B2 20100609; US 6270315 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110929

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110929

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110929

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI