Global Patent Index - EP 0990774 A1

EP 0990774 A1 2000-04-05 - Three-dimensional cam device and method of making a three-dimensional cam for a valve drive system for engines

Title (en)

Three-dimensional cam device and method of making a three-dimensional cam for a valve drive system for engines

Title (de)

Dreidimensionaler Nocken und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines dreidimensionalen Nockens in einer Ventilsteuerungsvorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Came tri-dimensionelle et methode de fabrication d'une came tri-dimensionelle pour commande de soupape de moteur

Publication

EP 0990774 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119451 A

Priority

  • EP 99119451 A
  • JP 27814998 A

Abstract (en)

A three-dimensional cam device having a cam follower adapted to rock in a direction inclined with respect to the direction of displacement of a cam surface of a three-dimensional cam. The sliding surface of the cam follower is in the form of a convex of an arcuate cross-section when viewed from the axial direction of a rocker shaft, and at least a pad of the cam surface is formed with a concave surface such that the axially central portion of a three-dimensional cam is curved inward from other portions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/26; F01L 13/00; F01L 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/08 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0042 (2013.01); F01L 1/08 (2013.01); F01L 1/262 (2013.01); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990774 A1 20000405; EP 0990774 B1 20040721

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918766 P 20040826

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI