Global Patent Index - EP 0990789 A2

EP 0990789 A2 2000-04-05 - Method initiating the control of a fuel pump

Title (en)

Method initiating the control of a fuel pump

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Kraftstoffpumpe

Title (fr)

Méthode d'initialisation de la commande d'une pompe à carburant

Publication

EP 0990789 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119317 A

Priority

DE 19844537 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel pump and/or pressure regulating valve control method controls the operation of the electric fuel pump (17) and/or the pressure regulating valve (18) for a timed duration after operation of the ignition switch. It is dependent on the required heating duration for a glow plug. The heating duration may be combined with variable duration dependant on the temperature for providing the control duration for the fuel pump, and/or the pressure regulating valve.

Abstract (de)

Es wirden Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Elektrokraftstoffpumpe 17 und/oder eines Druckregelventils 18 bei einem Motor beschrieben, bei denen die Ansteuerung noch bei Motorstillstand unmittelbar nach Betätigen des Zündschalters ZÜ erfolgt, wobei die Dauer der Ansteuerung der Elektrokraftstoffpumpe 17 und/oder des Druckregelventils 18 abhängig von einer weiteren Bedingung, beispielsweise der Vorglühzeit tv bei einem Dieselmotor gewählt wird. Im Startfall dauert die Ansteuerzeit so lange, bis die temperaturabhängige Vorglühzeit tv und zusätzlich eine wählbare Zeitspanne tEKP abgelaufen sind. Danach wird die Ansteuerung entweder beendet oder es erfolgt ein Übergang in die normale Ansteuerung für die EKP oder das DRV, wobei die Entscheidung abhängig von erkannten Motor-Drehzahlbedingungen erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/08; F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02P 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3854 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/3082 (2013.01); F02P 19/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990789 A2 20000405; EP 0990789 A3 20011004; EP 0990789 B1 20060322; DE 19946792 A1 20000504; DE 59913243 D1 20060511

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913243

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100929

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100929

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913243 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050201

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI