Global Patent Index - EP 0990792 A2

EP 0990792 A2 2000-04-05 - Common-Rail fuel injection system

Title (en)

Common-Rail fuel injection system

Title (de)

Common-Rail Einspritzsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant de type Common-Rail

Publication

EP 0990792 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116319 A

Priority

CH 198798 A

Abstract (en)

The common-rail fuel injection system has a high pressure pump (16) with a reciprocating piston (20) displaced within a feed space (40), coupled to the pressure space (28) of the rail (14), for supplying the fuel injectors (22). The rail has a recess (36) acting as part of the feed space, coupled to the pressure space via a channel (32) containing a valve (30), a second valve (42) provided within the feed channel (44) for the high pressure pump.

Abstract (de)

Ein Common-Rail Einspritzsystem (10) weist ein Rail (14) mit einem Druckraum (28) sowie einen Injektor (22) und eine Hochdruckpumpe (16) mit einem Förderraum (40) und einem Plungerkolben (20) auf. Das Rail (14) weist eine Ausnehmung (36) auf, deren Ausnehmungswände (38) einen Teil des Förderraumes (40) begrenzen. Über einen Durchlasskanal (32) ist der Förderraum (40) mit dem Druckraum (28) des Rails (14) verbunden. Über einen Zuführkanal (44) wird bei einem Saughub des Plungerkolbens (20) dem Förderraum (40) ein Druckmedium (A) zugeführt. Sowohl im Zuführkanal (44) als auch im Durchlasskanal (32) sind Ventile (30, 42) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/02; F02M 59/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/08 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990792 A2 20000405; EP 0990792 A3 20030521; JP 2000110692 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031122

2004-03-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/02 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/08 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 55/02 B

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CRT COMMON RAIL TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI