Global Patent Index - EP 0990802 A2

EP 0990802 A2 2000-04-05 - Electrohydraulic speed control device for an hydraulic lifting cylinder

Title (en)

Electrohydraulic speed control device for an hydraulic lifting cylinder

Title (de)

Elektrohydraulische Einrichtung zur Geschwindigkeitssteuerung eines hydraulischen Hubzylinders

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage de vitesse électrohydraulique pour un vérin hydraulique

Publication

EP 0990802 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114323 A

Priority

DE 19844795 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement comprises a single proportional valve (18) for lowering the cylinder, which is connected in a bypass conductor (17) led from the lift cylinder (11) to a pressure medium reservoir (13). A current sensor (25) is provided for measuring a current supplied to an electric motor (21) for operating a pressure medium pump when lifting the cylinder. The signals of the current sensor are processed by an electric control arrangement (22) for controlling the proportional valve, dependent on a load pressure in the lift cylinder, to enable a load pressure compensated control. An Independent claim is provided for a corresponding speed control method.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine elektrohydraulische Einrichtung (10, 40) zur Geschwindigkeitssteuerung eines hydraulischen Hubzylinders (11) vorgeschlagen, der beim Heben von einer Konstantpumpe (12) über ein Rückschlagventil (15) mit Druckmittel beaufschlagbar ist, wobei ein Teil des hydraulischen Volumenstroms von der Konstantpumpe (12) über ein in eine Bypaßleitung (17) geschaltetes Proportionaldrosselventil (18) zum Tank (13) abführbar ist. Die beim Senken abgeschaltete Konstantpumpe (12) ist nur beim Heben eingeschaltet und wird dabei mit konstanter Drehzahl von einem Gleichstrommotor (21) angetrieben, dessen elektrischer Motorstrom von einem Stromsensor (25) gemessen wird. Diese Meßgröße Motorstrom ist proportional zum Druck im Hubzylinder (11) und ermöglicht eine elektronisch lastkompensierte Steuerung des Hubzylinders (11), die auch beim Senken weitgehend wirksam ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/05; F15B 11/044; F15B 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/044 (2006.01); F15B 11/05 (2006.01); F15B 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/044 (2013.01); F15B 11/055 (2013.01); F15B 21/087 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/41581 (2013.01); F15B 2211/426 (2013.01); F15B 2211/46 (2013.01); F15B 2211/473 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50536 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5151 (2013.01); F15B 2211/55 (2013.01); F15B 2211/615 (2013.01); F15B 2211/633 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6346 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7052 (2013.01); F15B 2211/75 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990802 A2 20000405; EP 0990802 A3 20010725; EP 0990802 B1 20041013; DE 19844795 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110721

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910818

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100802

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910818 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2002-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI