Global patent index - EP 0990835 A1

EP 0990835 A1 2000-04-05 - Device for monitoring a secure position (for ex. closed position of a door)

Title (en)

Device for monitoring a secure position (for ex. closed position of a door)

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für eine besonders sichere Positionsüberwachung (z.B. Tür geschlossen Position)

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour un contrôle de position de sécurité (par ex. position fermée d'une porte)

Publication

EP 0990835 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123880 A

Priority

CH 199298 A

Abstract (en)

The position monitoring device uses 2 or more optical fibres (3) incorporated within 2 relatively displaced mechanical parts (1,2), e.g. of a door hinge or bolt, which are coupled to an electronic evaluation stage (4) for detecting when the parts are in a defined relative position by detecting the light coupling between the optical fibres when the optical fibres are aligned coaxially.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung für sichere Ueberwachung (z.B. der Türflügelposition) besteht aus zwei oder mehreren (Licht-)Wellenleitern (3) und einer Auswerteelektronik. Die (Licht-)Wellenleiter (3) befinden sich im Inneren von mechanischen Teilen (1,2), welche gegeneinander beweglich sind.(z.B. Scharniere, Riegelbolzen usw.) In einer bestimmten Position dieser Teile (1,2) kann die (Licht-)Welle durchgehen und wie durch die Auswerteelektronik detektiert. Dadurch lässt sich feststellen, ob sich die einzelnen Teile in einer bevorzugten Position befinden; z.B. Türflügel in der geschlossenen Position. Die Ausführung ist sehr sicher, sogar falls in der Vorrichtung Bauteildefekte passieren, wird immer abgeschaltet. Sie lässt sich nicht einfach überlisten, und die Teile mit (Licht-)Wellenleitern können sogar im ex-geschützten Bereich gefahrlos eingesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16P 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16P 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16P 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990835 A1 20000405

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI