Global Patent Index - EP 0990838 A2

EP 0990838 A2 2000-04-05 - Lamp for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Lamp for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Leuchte für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Lampe pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0990838 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118501 A

Priority

DE 19844594 A

Abstract (en)

The lamp unit has a reflector, a light source and a light cover (4) with a matrix of light dispersion elements (5) with a side row or column extending parallel to an angled opening edge (6) of the automobile body. The light cover light dispersion elements have a curvature which deflects the light in a vertical direction , the reflector having curved reflector elements for deflecting the light in a horizontal direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchte (1) mit einem einer Lichtquelle (2) zugeordneten Reflektor (3) und einer den Reflektor (3) abdeckenden Lichtscheibe (4) mit Streuelementen (5) zur Ablenkung des Lichtes, wobei die Streuelemente (5) gitterförmig in Zeilen (8) und Spalten (9) angeordnet sind, wobei die Zeilen (8) und/oder Spalten (9) jeweils nach und nach versetzt zueinander derart angeordnet sind, daß eine randseitige Zeile (8) und/oder randseitige Spalte (9) sich parallel zu einem schrägen Öffnungsrand (6) der Karrosserie erstreckt und daß zum einen die Streuelemente (5) eine solche Krümmung aufweisen, daß das Licht im wesentlichen in vertikaler Richtung (V) abgelenkt wird und daß zum anderen der Reflektor (3) eine Mehrzahl von Reflektorelementen (15) mit einer solchen Krümmung aufweist, daß das Licht in horizontaler Richtung (H) abgelenkt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/2212 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990838 A2 20000405; EP 0990838 A3 20020904; EP 0990838 B1 20060517; DE 19844594 A1 20000511; DE 59913430 D1 20060622; ES 2263244 T3 20061201

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-27 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59913430

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150919

2017-01-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170127

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070918

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2263244 T3

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913430 P 20060622

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21V 5/00 B, 7F 21V 7/00 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI