Global Patent Index - EP 0990839 A2

EP 0990839 A2 2000-04-05 - Dipped and main beam headlamp for vehicle

Title (en)

Dipped and main beam headlamp for vehicle

Title (de)

Abblendlicht-/Fernlichtscheinwerfereinheit für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Projecteur croisement-route pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0990839 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890306 A

Priority

AT 62998 U

Abstract (en)

The headlamp unit has 2 different reflector sections (2,6) for the dipped headlamp beam and the main headlamp beam, respectively reflecting light onto a projection lens (5) and directing light past the latter. A light stop (4) is positioned between a single light source (3) and the projection lens and a stop plate (7) is displaced parallel to the optical axis, for selectively blocking the light path between the light source and the main headlamp beam reflector section.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein Abblendlicht-/Fernlichtscheinwerfereinheit für ein Kraftfahrzeug, mit zwei unterschiedlich reflektierenden Reflektorabschnitten (2,6), von denen einer auf eine Projektionslinse (5) und der andere an dieser vorbei reflektiert und wobei zwischen einer einzigen Lichtquelle (3) und der Projektionslinse (5) eine Blende (4) angeordnet ist, mit dem Kennzeichen, daß der eine Reflektorabschnitt ein Abblendlichtreflektor (2) ist, der über eine feste Hell-/Dunkelblende (4) auf die Projektionslinse (5) reflektiert und der andere ein vom Abblendlichtreflektor (2) getrennter Fernlichtreflektor (6) ist, zwischen dem und der Lichtquelle (3) eine, insbesondere parallel zur optischen Achse bewegliche, Streifenblende (7) zur wahlweisen Abschattung des Fernlichteflektors (6) gegenüber der Lichtquelle (3) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/12; B60Q 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1757 (2013.01); F21S 48/1388 (2013.01); F21S 48/1768 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990839 A2 20000405; EP 0990839 A3 20020130; AT 3450 U1 20000327

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI