Global Patent Index - EP 0990844 A1

EP 0990844 A1 2000-04-05 - Flame tube for a heating installation burner

Title (en)

Flame tube for a heating installation burner

Title (de)

Brennerrohr für den Brenner einer Heizanlage

Title (fr)

Tube foyer pour le brûleur d'une installation de chauffage

Publication

EP 0990844 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118435 A

Priority

EP 98118435 A

Abstract (en)

In the area of the burner tube outlet (14) downstream behind the outlet nozzle (16) is a mixture component (15) movable with the nozzle. A valve member (22) is provided upstream in front of the outlet nozzle in the burner tube (10) and is fitted on the fuel feed tube and with it is axially displaceable. The valve member works in conjunction with a ring-type narrowed area (21) of the burner tube.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Brennerrohr (10) für den Brenner einer Heizanlage vorgeschlagen, das als Strömungsrohr für die Luftströmung (13) eines vorgeschalteten Gebläses ausgebildet ist. Im Brennerrohr (10) ist insbesondere konzentrisch ein axial verschiebbares und mit einer Austrittsdüse (16) versehenes Brennstoff-Zuführungsrohr (17) angeordnet. Im Bereich des Brennerrohr-Ausgangs (14) ist stromabwärts hinter der Austrittsdüse (16) ein zusammen mit dieser verschiebbares Mischelement (15) angeordnet. Ein Ventilglied (22) der stromaufwärts vor der Austrittsdüse (16) im Brennerrohr (10) angeordneten Drosseleinrichtung ist am Brennstoff-Zuführungsrohr (17) angebracht und mit diesem zusammen axial verschiebbar, wobei das Ventilglied (22) mit einem ringartigen Verengungsbereich (21) des Brennerrohrs zusammenwirkt. Bei dieser Anordnung kann mit einer einzigen Stelleinrichtung zusammen mit dem Mischelement gleichzeitig eine Drosseleinrichtung zur Pressungseinstellung bewegt werden, wobei zusätzlich eine Homogenisierung einer ungleichmäßigen oder drallbehafteten Strömung vom Gebläse her erreicht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/40; F23C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/408 (2013.01); F23C 7/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990844 A1 20000405; EP 0990844 B1 20021113; AT 227823 T 20021115; DE 59806282 D1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806282 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227823 T 20021115

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990322

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI