Global patent index - EP 0990845 A2

EP 0990845 A2 2000-04-05 - Atmospheric water cooled gas burner

Title (en)

Atmospheric water cooled gas burner

Title (de)

Atmosphärischer, wassergekühlter Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur atmosphérique à gaz refroidi par eau

Publication

EP 0990845 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115368 A

Priority

DE 19845356 A

Abstract (en)

The burner deck is provided with rows of outflow apertures (18) for fuel - air mixture and between the rows run cooling channels (20). The burner deck is composed of two plate formations, of which the one is provided with outflow apertures and the other with recesses (48) which do not obstruct flow. The cooling channels are formed by local formations of at least one of the two plates. Preferably the combustion zones have strips (42) made of high temperature-resistant ferritic refined steel.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einem atmosphärischen, wassergekühlten Gasbrenner, mit einer Mischkammer (32), die sich über die gesamte Brennfläche erstreckt, und mit einem auf die Mischkammer (32) aufgesetzten Brennerdeck (10), das mit in Reihen angeordneten Ausströmöffnungen (18, 66) für das Brennstoff-Luftgemisch und mit zwischen den Reihen verlaufenden Kühlkanälen (20) versehen ist. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß das Brennerdeck (10) aus zwei Blechplatinen (12, 14) gebildet ist, von denen die eine mit den Ausströmöffnungen (18, 66) und die andere mit die Strömung nicht behindernden Aussparungen (48) versehen ist, und daß ferner die Kühlkanäle (20) durch örtliche Ausformungen mindestens eines der beiden Blechplatinen (12, 14) gebildet sind. Dadurch kann die Herstellung des Brennerdecks erleichtert werden. Bei einer bevorzugten Ausführung sind in dessen Brennzonen (16) Brennzonenleisten (42, 50, 58, 72) vorgesehen, die aus einem hochtemperaturbeständigen ferritischen Edelstahl bestehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/58; F23D 14/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/04 (2006.01); F23D 14/58 (2006.01); F23D 14/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/78 (2013.01); F23D 14/045 (2013.01); F23D 14/583 (2013.01); F23D 2203/101 (2013.01); F23D 2212/20 (2013.01); F23D 2213/00 (2013.01); F23D 2214/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19545844 A1 19970612 - BUDERUS HEIZTECHNIK GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990845 A2 20000405; EP 0990845 A3 20000802; EP 0990845 B1 20040616; DE 19845356 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-06-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-12-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-10-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041011

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909734

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI