Global patent index - EP 0990851 A1

EP 0990851 A1 2000-04-05 - Gas turbine combustor

Title (en)

Gas turbine combustor

Title (de)

Brennkammer für eine Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion pour une turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 0990851 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810983 A

Priority

EP 98810983 A

Abstract (en)

The cooling air is fed by channels (14,16) outside the inner walls (12,17) and formed by an outer wall (11) of the combustion chamber and the inner walls. At least in a part area of the inner walls the one wall (17) is formed from at least two parallel holed plates (24). A first holed plate abuts directly on the cooling air channels and is provided with several further apertures (25). Through the further apertures cooling air flows out of the cooling air channels into a first intermediate volume (26). Behind the first holed plate in the direction of the combustion zone (23) is a further holed plate which also has a number of further apertures (27a).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Brennkammer für eine Gasturbine, wird Schallabsorption in einem breiten Frequenzbereich bei gleichzeitiger Kühlung der Anordnung und geringem Platzbedarf dadurch bewirkt, dass zumindest in einem Teilbereich der Innenwände (12,17) die Innenwand (17) aus wenigstens zwei, im wesentlichen parallel zueinander angeordneten Lochplatten (24,17a) gebildet wird, und dass die Abstände zwischen den Lochplatten (24,17a) und die geometrischen Abmessungen der Öffnungen (27a) so gewählt sind, dass eine Mehrzahl von untereinander verbundenen Helmholtzresonatoren gebildet wird, und dass zusätzlich weitere Mittel vorhanden sind, welche schallabsorbierend wirken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/10; F23M 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 99/00 (2010.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/10 (2013.01); F23M 20/005 (2013.01); F23R 3/002 (2013.01); F05B 2260/96 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01); F23R 2900/03341 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990851 A1 20000405; EP 0990851 B1 20030723; DE 59809097 D1 20030828

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59809097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59809097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59809097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59809097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59809097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59809097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI