Global Patent Index - EP 0990861 A2

EP 0990861 A2 2000-04-05 - Water heater

Title (en)

Water heater

Title (de)

Warmwasser-Heizgerät

Title (fr)

Chauffe-eau

Publication

EP 0990861 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118879 A

Priority

DE 19844856 A

Abstract (en)

The heater has a heat exchanger (7) heated by a burner (4), which is connected to a cold water intake (12) and a hot water outlet (13). A regulator controlling the fuel supply to the burner is connected to a flow sensor (1) in the cold water intake, and a temperature sensor (11) in the hot water outlet. A bypass channel (17) is positioned in front of the flow sensor in flow direction, between intake and outlet. Flow limiters (15,14) are positioned in the bypass channel and a heater circuit (5,10) containing the heat exchanger.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Warmwasser-Heizgerät angegeben, das einen durch einen Brenner (4) geheizten Wärmetauscher (7) aufweist, der mit einem Kaltwasser-Einlaß (12) und einem Warmwasser-Auslaß (13) verbunden ist. Die Brennstoffzufuhr zu dem Brenner (4) wird durch einen Regler (2, 3) gesteuert. Die Einschaltung des Brenners (4) wird durch einen Durchflußsensor (1) im Kaltwasser-Einlaß (12) und durch einen Temperatursensor (11) im Warmwasser-Auslaß (10, 13) gesteuert. Ein Bypaßkanal (17) ist in Fließrichtung vor dem Durchflußsensor (1) zwischen dem Kaltwasser-Einlaß (12) und dem Warmwasser-Auslaß (13) angeordnet. Durchflußbegrenzer (14, 15) sind im Bypaßkanal (17) und in dem den Wärmetauscher (7) aufweisenden Heizkreis (5, 10) angeordnet. Ein Durchflußmengen-Regelorgan (16) im Bypaßkanal (17) übernimmt die Funktion des Sollwerteinstellers. Bei voll geöffnetem Durchflußmengen-Regelorgan (16) sind die Durchflußbegrenzer (14, 15) so bemessen, daß der Fluidwiderstand des Heizkreises (5, 7, 10) und des Bypaßkanales (17) gleich groß sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/20; F24D 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/2035 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990861 A2 20000405; EP 0990861 A3 20020807; EP 0990861 B1 20051116; DE 19844856 C1 20000518; DE 59912798 D1 20051222; ES 2252901 T3 20060516

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130925

2015-04-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150406

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130924

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130924

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59912798

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130924

2014-04-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120913

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20080618

2008-07-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2252901

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912798

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 24H 9/20 A

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 24D 19/10 B

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI