Global patent index - EP 0990865 A2

EP 0990865 A2 2000-04-05 - Measuring system for determining the moisture content of a fibrous web

Title (en)

Measuring system for determining the moisture content of a fibrous web

Title (de)

Messsystem zur Bestimmung des Feuchtigkeitsgehaltes einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Système de mesure pour déterminer le taux d'humidité d'une feuille fibreuse

Publication

EP 0990865 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113968 A

Priority

DE 19844927 A

Abstract (en)

Measurements of the residual moisture content in a fiber web (1) are taken at a point where the web is supported by a surface which is free of water. Preferred Features: The measurements are taken with infrared rays or radioactive radiation. The residual moisture content level is taken from the degree of radiation absorption in the web (1). The web support surface, free of water, is a roller (4). The transmitter (2) and/or receiver (3) are within the roller (4). The web (1) moisture measurements are taken at the end of and/or after the press section and/or in the drying section.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Meßsystem zur Bestimmung des Feuchtigkeitsgehaltes einer Papier-, Textil- oder einer anderen Faserstoffbahn (1) in einer Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Veredlung der Faserstoffbahn (1) in einem Bereich der Maschine in dem die Faserstoffbahn (1) ohne freien Zug, d. h. nicht ungestützt verläuft. Ermöglicht wird dies dadurch, daß die Messung dort erfolgt, wo die Faserstoffbahn (1) auf einer im wesentlichen wasserfreien, mitlaufenden Oberfläche aufliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/00; F26B 25/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 13/14 (2006.01); F26B 25/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/14 (2013.01); F26B 13/101 (2013.01); F26B 25/22 (2013.01); Y10S 162/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4325915 A1 19950209 - FLEISSNER MASCHF GMBH CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990865 A2 20000405; EP 0990865 A3 20011205; EP 0990865 B1 20051012; DE 19844927 A1 20000406; DE 59912646 D1 20060223; US 6254726 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140717

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59912646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59912646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120718

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040130

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI