Global Patent Index - EP 0990941 A2

EP 0990941 A2 2000-04-05 - Laminated transparent structure for reflective display

Title (en)

Laminated transparent structure for reflective display

Title (de)

Lichtdurchlässiger Schichtstoff für reflektive Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Structure lamellaire transparente pour dispositif d'affichage réflectif

Publication

EP 0990941 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118896 A

Priority

JP 27857298 A

Abstract (en)

A laminated transparent structure for a reflective display which is used, for example, as a head-up display of an automotive vehicle. The laminated transparent structure comprises a glass plate. A transparent layer is bonded to the glass plate. An optical rotation film is disposed between the glass plate and the transparent layer. Additionally, a hot-melt adhesive is disposed between the optical rotation film and the glass plate to bond the optical rotation film to the glass plate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/1335; G02B 27/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 35/00 (2006.01); B60J 1/02 (2006.01); C03C 27/12 (2006.01); G02B 5/30 (2006.01); G02B 27/01 (2006.01); G02B 27/28 (2006.01); G02F 1/1333 (2006.01); G02F 1/1335 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G02B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 17/10036 (2013.01); B32B 17/10018 (2013.01); G02B 27/01 (2013.01); G02B 27/0101 (2013.01); G02B 27/283 (2013.01); G02B 5/30 (2013.01); G02B 2027/012 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31801 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990941 A2 20000405; EP 0990941 A3 20040211; EP 0990941 B1 20080416; DE 69938525 D1 20080529; DE 69938525 T2 20090610; JP 2000103655 A 20000411; JP 4052741 B2 20080227; US 6327089 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090924

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-02-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938525 P 20080529

2008-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040914

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02F 1/1335 A

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 27/01 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI