Global Patent Index - EP 0990952 A3

EP 0990952 A3 2000-11-02 - Electrophotographic Photoreceptor

Title (en)

Electrophotographic Photoreceptor

Title (de)

Elektrophotographischer Photorezeptor

Title (fr)

Photorécepteur électrophotographique

Publication

EP 0990952 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99118507 A

Priority

  • JP 27524598 A
  • JP 7030899 A
  • JP 20618999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0990952A2] An electrophotographic photoreceptor characterized in comprising a resin layer containing a hardenable siloxane-based resin having a partial structure described below: <CHEM> wherein x represents a charge transportability providing group, which is a group bonding to Y in the formula via a carbon atom constituting said providing group, and Y represents at least a bivalent atom or group, excluding adjacent bonding atoms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/07; G03G 5/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/047 (2006.01); G03G 5/07 (2006.01); G03G 5/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/047 (2013.01); G03G 5/078 (2013.01); G03G 5/14773 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990952 A2 20000405; EP 0990952 A3 20001102; EP 0990952 B1 20071031; CN 1217242 C 20050831; CN 1252541 A 20000510; DE 69937433 D1 20071213; DE 69937433 T2 20080214; US 6143452 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-08-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937433 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010421

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI