Global Patent Index - EP 0990955 A2

EP 0990955 A2 2000-04-05 - Method for controlling the flow of paper objects in a paper processing system

Title (en)

Method for controlling the flow of paper objects in a paper processing system

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steuern des Durchflusses von Papierartikeln in einem Papierverarbeitungssystem

Title (fr)

Méthode de contrôle du flux d'articles en papier dans un système de manipulation de papier

Publication

EP 0990955 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118922 A

Priority

DE 19844859 A

Abstract (en)

A method for controlling the flow of paper objects in a paper processing system (PPS), having a main copier and/or printer unit with an output accessory manager (OAM) and at least one paper object processing device (POPD1, POPD2,...POPDn). The method is carried out by the following steps: generating a paper object header (POH) for a paper object (PO) in the output accessory manager (OAM); sending the paper object header (POH) to one of plural downstream paper object processing devices (POPDs) prior to the arrival of a paper object (PO) at the one paper object processing device (POPD), wherein the paper object header (POH) is updated, modified and sent to another of the plural paper processing devices along a route; absorbing the paper object header (POH) in a last paper object processing device (POPD) of the plural paper object processing devices in the route and generating in the last paper object processing device (POPD) a paper object header response (POHR) and sending the paper object header response (POHR) to the output accessory manager (OAM); repeating the above steps for other paper objects (POs) in a current job; generating a paper object coming (POC) in the output accessory manager (OAM) and sending the paper object coming (POC) to the one paper object processing device (POPD) after the paper object header (POH) is received by the one paper object processing device (POPD) wherein the paper object coming (POC) precedes the paper object; processing the paper object (PO) in the paper object processing device (POPD) and forwarding the paper object coming (POC) and the paper object (PO) to another of the plural paper object processing devices (POPD) wherein the above two steps are repeated for other paper objects in the current job until the last paper object (PO) is successfully delivered to the last paper object processing device (POPD) in the route; and generating a paper object delivered (POD) in the last paper object processing device (POPD) in the route and sending the paper object delivered (POD) to the output accessory manager (OAM). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/11 (2006.01); B41J 11/44 (2006.01); B65H 37/04 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6529 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1675 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990955 A2 20000405; EP 0990955 A3 20010321; EP 0990955 B1 20021204; DE 19844859 A1 20000420; DE 69904276 D1 20030116; DE 69904276 T2 20030828; JP 2000109264 A 20000418; US 6241404 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69904276

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904276 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FIETZE, ROMAN

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GLEMSER, GERHARD

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANGEBRAKE, DIRK

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROEBSTLE, ALBRECHT

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GODSHALK, RUSSEL L.

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEBERLING, ALLEN D.

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI