Global Patent Index - EP 0991010 A2

EP 0991010 A2 2000-04-05 - Method for identifying characteristics of an utility article

Title (en)

Method for identifying characteristics of an utility article

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erkennen von Eigenschaften eines Gebrauchsgegenstandes

Title (fr)

Méthode d'identification de caractréristiques d'un objet d'usage courant

Publication

EP 0991010 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112122 A

Priority

DE 19828145 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828145A1] The method involves mounting at least one transponder on each object. The transponder transmits data about the characteristics of the object. The data can be detected by a receiver for subsequent visual display by using a monitor, and can be detected acoustically. The receiver contains electronic circuits for storing and processing the received data.

Abstract (de)

Für ein solches Verfahren sind an vorzugsweise im Haushalt vorhandenen Gebrauchsgegenständen jeweils mindestens ein Daten über die Eigenschaften dieses Gebrauchsgegenstandes sendender Transponder vorgesehen. Die gesendeten Daten werden mittels eines Empfangsgerätes erkennbar gemacht. Mittels eines solchen Verfahrens kann der Benutzer eines Gebrauchsgegenstandes auf einfache Weise schnell über die Eigenschaften des betreffenden Gebrauchsgegenstandes in Kenntnis gesetzt werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828145 A1 19991230; EP 0991010 A2 20000405; EP 0991010 A3 20020619

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080930

2004-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 7/00 A, 7G 06K 7/08 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI