Global Patent Index - EP 0991025 A2

EP 0991025 A2 2000-04-05 - Method for entering data into a postage computer and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for entering data into a postage computer and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Dateneingabe in einen Portorechner und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d'entrée de données dans un calculateur d'affranchissement et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0991025 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250283 A

Priority

DE 19843252 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19843252A1] The method involves loading and updating of postage table data in the postage computer, with reviewing of the stored postage date using the current date. The loading of new postage table data results at an user-defined first time, and the updating of new postage table data results at a second point in time defined by the respective post carrier. An Independent claim is provided for a corresponding arrangement implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zur Dateneingabe in einen Portorechner umfaßt ein Laden und Aktualisieren von Tariftabellendaten im Portorechner, wobei jedoch beide Vorgänge erfindungsgemäß zeitlich entkoppelt voneinander durchgeführt werden. Die Übertragung und Speicherung von einer neuen Portogebührentabelle in einem Portorechner kann on demand oder vorprogammiert auf einen ersten Zeitpunkt automatisch durchgeführt werden. Das Aktualisieren von Tariftabellendaten wird einem zweiten Zeitpunkt automatisch durchgeführt. Das Verfahren ist sowohl für Anwender von Frankiermaschinen vorgesehen, als auch für Portorechner enthaltene Waagen bzw. ähnliche Geräte geeignet. Die Anordnung enthält einen Portorechner und einem Speicher (16) für Dienstdaten mit Speicherbereichen für auf Tariftabellen bezogene Daten. Der Portorechner ist zum Detektieren der Eingabe und Einspeichern eines Ladeerfordernisses, zum Überprüfen des Ladeerfordernisses und zum Laden bei einem Vorliegen des Ladeerfordernisses, zur Eingabe eines Umstellungserfordernis beim Laden, sowie zum Überprüfen des Umstellungserfordernis und Umstellung auf die aktuelle neue Tariftabelle oder Übergang in den Betriebsmodus programmiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00354 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843252 A1 20000316; AU 4750599 A 20000316; DE 59913172 D1 20060427; EP 0991025 A2 20000405; EP 0991025 A3 20001213; EP 0991025 B1 20060301; US 6615196 B1 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 59913172

- Effective date: 20150330

2013-05-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59913172

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-04-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20130319

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE)

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913172 P 20060427

2006-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/02 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI