Global Patent Index - EP 0991038 A3

EP 0991038 A3 2000-09-27 - Commodity discharge apparatus for vending machine, in which a commodity can be successfully released from a suspension member

Title (en)

Commodity discharge apparatus for vending machine, in which a commodity can be successfully released from a suspension member

Title (de)

Warenabgabevorrichtung für Verkaufsautomat, in welchem Waren aus einem Hängermagazin leicht freigegeben werden können

Title (fr)

Dispositif de délivrance d'articles pour une machine de vente, dans laquelle un article peut être facilement libéré d'un élément de suspension

Publication

EP 0991038 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99307755 A

Priority

  • JP 27674698 A
  • JP 27674798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0991038A2] For suspending a commodity (100) in a commodity discharge apparatus for a vending machine, a commodity suspension member (3) is connected to an endless chain (2) forming an elongated shape. A suspension-releasing mechanism (1b) is operatively coupled to the commodity suspension member for releasing the commodity from the commodity suspension member at end of the elongated shape. For enhancing the commodity to be released from the commodity suspension member, a release enhancement mechanism (5b) is placed adjacent to the end of the elongated shape and cooperated with the suspension-releasing mechanism. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/58; B65G 17/20; G07F 11/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991038 A2 20000405; EP 0991038 A3 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 11/58 A, 7G 07F 11/64 B, 7B 65G 17/20 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI