Global Patent Index - EP 0991042 A2

EP 0991042 A2 2000-04-05 - Signalling device and monitoring system

Title (en)

Signalling device and monitoring system

Title (de)

Signalgeber und Überwachungssystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif de signalisation et système de surveillance

Publication

EP 0991042 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307216 A

Priority

GB 9821059 A

Abstract (en)

A signalling device, such as a fire detecting device, has a head (2) which is removable from a base (1). The head has circuit means (4,5,6) for sensing and signalling a change in given condition. The base is connected to supply lines and has fault signalling means (3) for generating a fault signal due to head removal or some other device fault. As the same signal is generated in each case, the invention provides an economic, simple and reliable solution to the problem of signalling fault conditions. Preferably, the fault signalling means includes a first circuit (3) in the base (1) which responds to an output from a second circuit (7) in the head (2) so that, if the head is not fitted to the base, the first circuit (3) responds to the absence of said output from the second circuit (7) in order to apply the fault signal to the lines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/06 (2006.01); G08B 17/00 (2006.01); G08B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2341964 A 20000329; GB 2341964 B 20021211; GB 9821059 D0 19981118; EP 0991042 A2 20000405; EP 0991042 A3 20010110; JP 2000113341 A 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040527

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08B 29/06 A

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI