Global patent index - EP 0991060 A2

EP 0991060 A2 2000-04-05 - Optical information recording medium, optical information recording apparatus, and method of recording test signal on the same

Title (en)

Optical information recording medium, optical information recording apparatus, and method of recording test signal on the same

Title (de)

Optisches Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, optisches Informationsaufzeichnungsgerät, und Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung eines Testsignals darauf

Title (fr)

Support d'enregistrement d'informations optiques, appareil d'enregistrement d'informations optiques, et procédé d'enregistrement d'un signal d'essai sur ledit support

Publication

EP 0991060 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306751 A

Priority

JP 27389698 A

Abstract (en)

An optical information recording apparatus, an optical information recording method, and an optical information recording medium that enable information signals to be recorded precisely by determining recording conditions such as recording power, edge positions of recording pulses, and the like suitably before recording information signals. An edge test signal generation circuit (4) supplies a test signal for optimizing edge positions of recording pulses. In order to suppress the variation in intervals between edges due to mark distortion caused by overwriting, test recording is carried out using this test signal in a plurality of sectors on the optical information recording medium with a test recording start point being shifted at random in each sector by a recording start point shifting circuit (3). A system control circuit (2) calculates an average of intervals between edges in test signals reproduced from the plurality of sectors and determines the difference between the average and an original interval between edges in the test signal, thus determining a compensation volume for edge positions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/0045 (2006.01); G11B 7/125 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/0045 (2013.01); G11B 7/126 (2013.01); G11B 7/1263 (2013.01); G11B 7/1267 (2013.01); G11B 7/0062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991060 A2 20000405; EP 0991060 A3 20000809; EP 0991060 B1 20060322; CN 100365708 C 20080130; CN 1177315 C 20041124; CN 1250208 A 20000412; CN 1253862 C 20060426; CN 1253863 C 20060426; CN 1263004 C 20060705; CN 1263005 C 20060705; CN 1501353 A 20040602; CN 1501354 A 20040602; CN 1501355 A 20040602; CN 1501356 A 20040602; CN 1501357 A 20040602; DE 69930480 D1 20060511; DE 69930480 T2 20060824; EP 1647979 A2 20060419; EP 1647979 A3 20081210; ID 24833 A 20000824; JP 2000105926 A 20000411; JP 4272279 B2 20090603; KR 100390470 B1 20030704; KR 100400436 B1 20031001; KR 100452068 B1 20041008; KR 20030020427 A 20030308; KR 20030020428 A 20030308; MY 128258 A 20070131; MY 131749 A 20070830; MY 131936 A 20070928; MY 131937 A 20070928; TW 466478 B 20011201; US 6480449 B1 20021112; US 6526012 B1 20030225; US 6526013 B1 20030225; US 6529457 B1 20030304; WO 0019420 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69930480

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-05-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NARUMI, KENJI

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MIYAGAWA, NAOYASU,C/O R. 402, LIONS MANSION

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041013

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 11B 7/00 A, 7G 11B 7/125 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI