Global Patent Index - EP 0991093 A1

EP 0991093 A1 2000-04-05 - Method and device to interrupt electrical current

Title (en)

Method and device to interrupt electrical current

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur elektrischen Stromabschaltung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de coupure de courant électrique

Publication

EP 0991093 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402370 A

Priority

FR 9812336 A

Abstract (en)

In the closed position, a current (I1) flows through two contacts (10,11). When the contacts are opened an arc is formed. To extinguish the arc quickly, a second current (I2) is passed through one contact at right angles to the first, forming a magnetic field which extinguishes arc formations.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de soufflage d'un arc de coupure par injection d'un courant électrique transitoire afin de créer un champ magnétique local contribuant au soufflage de l'arc. Le courant électrique transitoire est injecté sous forme d'impulsion unique ou répétée de forte énergie dans l'un des contacts ou dans une pièce conductrice associée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 828865 A 19600224 - ALFRED VANG
  • [A] US 4286301 A 19810825 - PHAM VAN DOAN
  • [A] EP 0375310 A1 19900627 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]
  • [A] GREENWOOD A N ET AL: "THEORY AND APPLICATION OF THE COMMUTATION PRINCIPLE FOR HVDC CIRCUIT BREAKERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER APPARATUS AND SYSTEMS, vol. PAS91, no. 4, 1 July 1972 (1972-07-01), pages 1570 - 1574, XP002049258

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991093 A1 20000405; EP 0991093 B1 20040324; DE 69915756 D1 20040429; DE 69915756 T2 20040812; FR 2784223 A1 20000407; FR 2784223 B1 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150928

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150928

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150928

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69915756

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140915

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915756 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI