Global Patent Index - EP 0991096 A1

EP 0991096 A1 2000-04-05 - Electric lamp

Title (en)

Electric lamp

Title (de)

Elektrische Lampe

Title (fr)

Lampe électrique

Publication

EP 0991096 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112645 A

Priority

  • DE 19845190 A
  • US 37944499 A

Abstract (en)

An electric lamp has an adjusting ring (4) with three positioning points (4a) arranged in a common plane orientated vertically to the axis of the ring. The ring has three contact points with the lamp base (1) along its inner casing surface and is fixed to the base by the contact points. An electric lamp comprises a lamp base (1), a lamp vessel (2) anchored in the lamp base, a luminous element enclosing the lamp vessel, and an adjusting ring (4) with three positioning points (4a) arranged in a common plane orientated vertically to the axis of the ring. The ring has three contact points with the lamp base (1) along its inner casing surface and is fixed to the base by the contact points.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Lampe für einen Kfz-Scheinwerfer. Die Lampe ist mit einem Justierring (4) ausgestattet, der mindestens drei in einer gemeinsamen, senkrecht zur Ringachse des Justierringes (4) orientierten Ebene angeordnete Auflagepunkte (4a) aufweist. Entlang seiner inneren Mantelfläche besitzt der Justierring (4) mindestens drei Berührungspunkte (8a) mit dem Lampensockel (1), in denen der Justierring (4) an dem Lampensockel (1) fixiert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 5/56; H01K 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 5/56 (2006.01); B60Q 1/06 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/02 (2006.01); H01J 5/50 (2006.01); H01J 61/02 (2006.01); H01K 1/46 (2006.01); F21W 101/02 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 5/56 (2013.01); H01K 1/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991096 A1 20000405; EP 0991096 B1 20030219; CA 2281189 A1 20000330; DE 19845190 A1 20000406; DE 59904316 D1 20030327; ES 2193626 T3 20031101; HU 219697 B 20010628; HU 9903303 A2 20000428; HU 9903303 A3 20000529; HU 9903303 D0 19991228; JP 2000106081 A 20000411; KR 20000023519 A 20000425; US 6259192 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193626 T3

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904316 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI