Global patent index - EP 0991102 A1

EP 0991102 A1 2000-04-05 - Charge-up suppressing film for spacer in image forming apparatus

Title (en)

Charge-up suppressing film for spacer in image forming apparatus

Title (de)

Ladungsunterdrückende Schicht für Abstandshalter in Bilderzeugungsgerät

Title (fr)

Film supprimant de charges pour élément d'espacement in appareil de formation d'images

Publication

EP 0991102 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98308111 A

Priority

JP 28124398 A

Abstract (en)

On the substrate having a conductivity, a film is formed to partially expose the underlying substrate. This film can effectively suppress the generation of secondary electrons. The substrate having a conductivity may be an insulating substrate formed with an electroconductive film. Charges can be suppressed effectively by the film. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/87 (2006.01); H01J 29/02 (2006.01); H01J 29/86 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01); H05F 1/00 (2006.01); H05F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05F 1/00 (2013.01); H01J 29/028 (2013.01); H01J 29/864 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01); H01J 2329/864 (2013.01); H01J 2329/8645 (2013.01); H01J 2329/8655 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0851458 A1 19980701 - CANON KK [JP]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991102 A1 20000405; EP 0991102 B1 20090114; DE 69840477 D1 20090305; JP 2000113997 A 20000421

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131006

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69840477

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131006

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121016

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090114

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69840477

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-03-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2009-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021212

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI